Trustees UNITED RESPONSE
Charity number: 265249
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Malcolm Graham McCaig | Chair | 21 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Anichebe | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steven Jon Coleman | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vicky Whelan | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Suzanne Elouise Pawsey | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Odendaal | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Satya Kanta Samal | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Tavana | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alison Helen Stanley | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Hugh McLaughlin | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Guy Van Dichele | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.