Accounts and annual returns THE GREEK CATHEDRAL TRUST FUND

Charity number: 265710
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 12 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 14 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 03 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 23 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window