Financial history ST DENNIS WAR MEMORIAL INSTITUTE

Charity number: 265790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £3.77k £3.78k £32 £7.50k £3.75k
Total expenditure £3.53k £3.55k £25 £7.03k £6.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A