PETWORTH AND DISTRICT OVER 60'S DAY CENTRE

Charity number: 265875
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £5.24k £4.75k £10.93k £6.46k £4.84k
Total expenditure £4.47k £4.13k £15.81k £3.68k £4.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A