Financial history THE RAINFORD TRUST

Charity number: 266157
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £262.50k £294.51k £233.89k £346.98k £272.46k
Total expenditure £325.29k £238.05k £263.66k £223.79k £277.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A