THE WEAVERS' COMPANY BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 266189
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £610.52k £712.94k £681.81k £648.33k £595.08k
Total expenditure £574.29k £591.07k £670.06k £682.01k £495.09k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £164.39k £242.25k £232.47k £162.16k £160.57k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £446.13k £470.69k £449.34k £486.17k £434.51k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £242.25k £52.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £540.52k £466.78k £632.78k £643.47k £457.82k
Expenditure - Raising funds £33.77k £37.00k £37.28k £38.54k £37.27k
Expenditure - Governance £89.03k £0 £4.85k £5.07k £6.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £344.30k £466.78k £0 £550.53k £370.18k
Expenditure - Investment management £33.77k £37.00k £37.28k £38.54k £37.27k
Expenditure - Other £0 £87.30k £0 £0 £0