Financial history SOCIETY FOR COMPUTERS AND LAW

Charity number: 266331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £343.93k £348.14k £370.37k £382.00k £306.52k
Total expenditure £338.37k £388.85k £366.35k £372.71k £353.73k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A