Trustees MUNDESLEY VOLUNTEER INSHORE LIFEBOAT LIMITED
Charity number: 266406
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian Shaw | Chair | 06 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Bryan William Hall | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Fowler | Trustee | 04 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Hearn | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neil Lindsay Munro | Trustee | 06 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Francis | Trustee | 06 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Copping | Trustee | 03 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JOHN FRANCIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN VERNEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER ROBIN PAYNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR NICK ALEXANDER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH ANN PAYNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANICE FRANCIS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.