THE MOSSELSON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 266517
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £385.45k £283.82k £140.15k £104.19k £96.03k
Total expenditure £201.22k £145.20k £350.98k £220.44k £130.10k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A