Accounts and annual returns VALE OF HEALTH SOCIETY

Charity number: 267155
Charity reporting is overdue by 51 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 51 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 51 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 01 April 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 29 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 28 June 2021 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 10 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required