Financial history THE RHODODENDRON TRUST

Charity number: 267192
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £74.24k £84.62k £75.89k £146.47k £88.45k
Total expenditure £68.88k £69.10k £73.63k £81.65k £84.91k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A