Financial history NORTON-SUB-HAMDON VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity number: 267403
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £15.80k £19.32k £27.47k £15.56k £18.60k
Total expenditure £10.90k £20.02k £20.18k £12.69k £10.42k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £8.00k N/A N/A £10.00k