11TH CHELMSFORD (ST LUKE'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 267543
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £13.81k £16.41k £10.44k £17.85k £21.52k
Total expenditure £8.34k £6.23k £13.73k £10.95k £9.74k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A