THE FOUR LANES TRUST

Charity number: 267608
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £28.26k £35.59k £34.34k £29.26k £161.94k
Total expenditure £32.80k £37.21k £26.56k £49.29k £55.64k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A