THE PINDER RECREATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 267646
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £30.19k £64.12k £74.18k £45.84k £34.75k
Total expenditure £35.35k £78.40k £71.41k £28.34k £48.25k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A