Financial history 1ST SEND (ST MARY'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 267767
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £22.81k £21.29k £25.81k £3.55k £18.94k
Total expenditure £20.19k £24.07k £16.47k £7.77k £35.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A