MANACCAN AND ST ANTHONY INSTITUTE AND WAR MEMORIAL

Charity number: 267982
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £744 £40 £100 £146 £12.67k
Total expenditure £247 £267 £222 £159 £3.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £11.33k