Governing document THE AEROPLANE COLLECTION LIMITED
Charity number: 268238
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 DECEMBER 1973 AS AMENDED 17 AUGUST 1974, 14 AUGUST 1993 AND 24 APRIL 2010. as amended on 20 Apr 2013 as amended on 11 Nov 2022 as amended on 27 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PRESERVATION OF AIRCRAFT AND AERONAUTICAL EQUIPMENT OF HISTORICAL, TECHNICAL OR OTHER PUBLIC INTEREST AND IN AVIATION GENERALLY.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.