Financial history CHARITY OF WILLIAM BOTLEY

Charity number: 268418
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 24/12/2016 24/12/2017 24/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £9.22k £10.31k £10.89k £12.08k £7.54k
Total expenditure £13.53k £12.30k £14.31k £11.48k £12.31k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A