THE SUN BABIES' NURSERY

Charity number: 268423
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £48.95k £85.83k £105.51k £172.53k £162.92k
Total expenditure £54.81k £65.54k £77.74k £75.34k £62.09k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A