11th Southampton Scout Group

Charity number: 268584
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £14.13k £17.84k £17.90k £17.33k £23.60k
Total expenditure £11.05k £17.59k £20.31k £14.51k £21.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A