Trustees BECCLES UNIT 554 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS
Charity number: 268768
Charity reporting is up to date (15 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jodie Butcher | Trustee | 17 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Denise Hutton | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Woodward | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Clair Berry | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Court | Trustee | 13 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Julia Pelham | Trustee | 20 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
ALF MUFFETT | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.