ST ALBANS AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPERS

Charity number: 268838
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £14.94k £18.08k £4.62k £4.17k £1.27k
Total expenditure £3.06k £2.18k £5.06k £7.32k £2.77k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A