Trustees NORTHIAM VILLAGE HALL TRUST
Charity number: 269218
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Whiting | Chair | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Davies | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sue Schlesinger | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Fenton | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Wickens | Trustee | 30 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Palmer | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Palmer | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Robinson | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bernard Michael Bone | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Woodford Robinson | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Brough Sargent | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Giles | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.