Financial history THE SYDNEY LITTLER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 269257
Charity reporting is overdue by 81 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 03/06/2018 03/06/2019 03/06/2020 03/06/2021 03/06/2022
Total gross income £5.89k £6.21k £6.46k £5.39k £4.31k
Total expenditure £14.40k £30.15k £6.19k £15.96k £14.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A