Financial history THE MISSES THOMSON CHARITY

Charity number: 269420
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.08k £1.17k £1.19k £1.22k £1.24k
Total expenditure £1.12k £1.12k £1.20k £1.20k £1.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A