THE FRIENDS OF LANGRIDGE CHURCH

Charity number: 269438
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.19k £641 £784 £1.27k £26
Total expenditure £160 £184 £164 £170 £164
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A