Financial history ASSOCIATION OF PAST MEMBERS, ALL SAINTS, TOTTENHAM, LONDON N17 8HR BENEVOLENT (CHARITABLE) FUND

Charity number: 269514
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022
Total gross income £775 £510 £0 £25 £2.53k
Total expenditure £1.11k £680 £251 £299 £256
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A