1ST NEWTON ABBOT (KINGSTEIGNTON) SEA SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 269839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £13.45k £14.60k £20.63k £14.07k £22.10k
Total expenditure £14.28k £11.76k £18.48k £14.67k £8.38k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.33k £500 £1.61k £500 £19.78k