WORLD COMPASSION TRUST

Charity number: 270063
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £159.95k £101.28k £136.82k £113.12k £78.00k
Total expenditure £193.13k £100.91k £119.82k £131.85k £71.42k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A