Accounts and annual returns AMBERWOOD HIGHCLIFFE AFTERNOON WOMENS INSTITUTE
Charity number: 270231
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2008 | 16 February 2009 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2007 | 28 November 2007 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2006 | 03 October 2006 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2005 | 27 September 2005 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2004 | 30 September 2004 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2004 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window