THE DEMPSTER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 270559
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £3.62k £3.76k £3.97k £4.12k £3.47k
Total expenditure £3.00k £3.17k £4.04k £3.96k £2.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A