Accounts and annual returns AXMINSTER YOUNG FARMERS' CLUBS

Charity number: 271101
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 12 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 10 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 10 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 09 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 29 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window