1ST PARK STREET SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 271282
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £25.71k £38.30k £36.64k £36.52k £26.39k
Total expenditure £26.00k £42.01k £27.06k £27.96k £15.36k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A