Trustees GUILDFORD OPERA COMPANY
Charity number: 271484
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARION HUGHES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jamil Michelle Joseph | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Dawn Joseph | Trustee | 13 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Yvonne Barrett | Trustee | 17 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JEAN GOODING | Trustee | 28 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carlos Alberto Garcia Aguilar | Trustee | 30 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
GLENYS MARJORIE MAGILL | Trustee | 12 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
RITA ROWLAND | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.