CAMBRIDGESHIRE ARMY CADET FORCE CENTENARY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 271635
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £6.46k £1.48k £1.55k £1.60k £1.56k
Total expenditure £0 £1.60k £0 £1.50k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A