Trustees GIRLGUIDING FLEET DIVISION
Charity number: 271663
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pauline Mary Warner | Chair | 01 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Wendy Jane Bascal | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katy Anne Watson | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Fleur Collins | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Susan Walter | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Rachel Hills | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Alexandra Jane Deans | Trustee | 12 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Clair O'Connell | Trustee | 17 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Louise Williams | Trustee | 17 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
HELEN ANDERTON BA PGCE | Trustee | 02 May 2016 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.