THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S REDBOURN

Charity number: 271677
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £9.20k £59.90k £15.67k £12.93k £14.13k
Total expenditure £3.96k £342 £25.85k £14.87k £6.60k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A £1.39k N/A