Trustees SUSSEX CHORUS
Charity number: 271678
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW FOX | Chair | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Barnaby | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Jill Furber | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neil Peskett | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Wilson | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Seddon | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Cooper | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Rea | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID TETTERSELL | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy David Jalie | Trustee | 24 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
richard moon | Trustee | 30 September 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.