Financial history FIRST CHURCH OF CHRIST , SCIENTIST, WALTON AND WEYBRIDGE

Charity number: 271683
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022
Total gross income £51.66k £68.64k £47.80k £53.04k £350.00k
Total expenditure £47.90k £44.84k £45.14k £55.43k £70.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A