Trustees THE WILD FLOWER SOCIETY
Charity number: 271694
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR PETER JOHN LLEWELLYN | Chair | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Heather Fay Banks | Trustee | 02 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Clifford Southall | Trustee | 02 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Lewis | Trustee | 03 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steven David Andrew Little | Trustee | 03 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helen Margaret Dignum | Trustee | 31 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janet John | Trustee | 03 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA JOAN WYNN | Trustee | 16 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
DR NICHOLA JANE HAWKINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR SIR GHILLEAN TOLMIE PRANCE | Trustee |
|
||||||
ROBIN ALASTAIR BLADES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.