Trustees CHEDDON FITZPAINE MEMORIAL HALL
Charity number: 271701
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr MALCOLM WILLIAM LOWN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sean Fredrick Reece | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gabrielle Batsch | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emily Bottomley | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Donald Godfrey | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Hannis | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Hopkins | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Robert Batsch | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev James David Robert Cox | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne May Patricia Rigby | Trustee | 10 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Hughes | Trustee | 07 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ANN WALKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KAREN CURD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.