Financial history ST MARTIN-IN-THE-FIELDS RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 272055
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £7.57k £9.99k £7.94k £18.63k £18.08k
Total expenditure £11.33k £10.83k £10.95k £15.03k £20.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A