WIMBORNE MINSTER PRESERVATION AND DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 272123
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.68k £4.50k £4.77k £10.34k £0
Total expenditure £58 £72 £114 £134.27k £8.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A