ST MARTIN'S CLUB FOR THE PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED OF DOVER

Charity number: 272132
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £3.47k £5.48k £6.11k £5.73k £4.74k
Total expenditure £8.43k £7.31k £7.90k £7.44k £5.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A