Governing document THE DARTINGTON INTERNATIONAL SUMMER SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 JUN 1976 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 OCT 1976 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 JUL 1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 JUN 1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 JAN 1991 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 16 MAR 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE SCHEMES TO PROVIDE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF MUSIC AND RELATED ARTS INCLUDING OPERA,MUSIC THEATRE,ELECTRONIC MEDIA,MUSIC AND DANCE AND IN PARTICULAR TO SUPPORT AND ENCOURAGE THE DARTINGTON INTERNATIONAL SUMMER SCHOOL AND ITS SUCCESSOR BY WHATEVER NAME IT MAY BE KNOWN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.