CHILTERN OPEN AIR MUSEUM LIMITED

Charity number: 272381
Charity reporting is up to date (60 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £878.92k £830.74k £973.47k £764.26k £588.13k
Total expenditure £721.99k £761.62k £776.41k £887.26k £813.89k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500 £92.49k £35.75k £51.61k £3.73k
Income - Donations and legacies £349.51k £169.63k £314.83k £151.60k £81.95k
Income - Other trading activities £141.05k £212.18k £202.44k £206.29k £167.33k
Income - Charitable activities £386.39k £447.25k £455.15k £373.33k £336.30k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.97k £1.68k £1.06k £2.42k £2.55k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £30.62k £24.43k
Income - Legacies £145.00k £6.00k £242.84k £20.44k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £621.14k £645.90k £640.90k £727.72k £750.67k
Expenditure - Raising funds £100.85k £115.72k £135.51k £159.55k £63.22k
Expenditure - Governance £4.35k £4.84k £5.09k £10.96k £10.07k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0