THE FELLOWSHIP FARM GUEST HOUSE TRUST

Charity number: 272700
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £2.01k £2.18k £2.07k £2.10k £1.96k
Total expenditure £101 £3.26k £2.35k £2.21k £98
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A