Governing document THE SEAFORD MUSEUM AND HERITAGE SOCIETY
Charity number: 272864
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 DECEMBER 1975 AS AMENDED 14 MARCH 1981, 13 MARCH 1982, 26 APRIL 1986, 04 MARCH 1992, 15TH MARCH 1997 AND 17TH NOVEMBER 1999.
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY AND NATURAL HISTORY OF THE TOWN OF SEAFORD IN EAST SUSSEX AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
TOWN OF SEAFORD
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.