Trustees THE PRINCE PHILIP TRUST FUND
Charity number: 272927
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HRH THE EARL OF WESSEX | Chair | 28 February 2014 |
|
|||||||||||||
Christopher John Wilson | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Penelope Branch | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Peter John McKee | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Elizabeth Hewer | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Andrew Aden Mackenzie Try DL | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Richard George Probert Kidson | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
MAYOR OF THE ROYAL BOROUGH OF WINDSOR AND MAIDENHEAD | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Samantha Rayner | Trustee | 19 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||
CHRIS AITKEN | Trustee | 22 April 2015 |
|
|||||||||||||
DEPUTY RANGER | Trustee | 25 November 2014 |
|
|||||||||||||
GOVERNOR AND CONSTABLE OF WINDSOR CASTLE | Trustee | 25 November 2014 |
|
|
||||||||||||
HER MAJESTY'S LORD LIEUTENANT FOR BERKSHIRE | Trustee | 15 April 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.